THE SIMPSON HALL

Charity number: 239038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required