Accounts and annual returns UNKNOWN DONOR

Charity number: 239246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required