Financial history UNKNOWN DONOR

Charity number: 239246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.81k £30.61k £32.52k £35.54k £34.14k
Total expenditure £43.21k £12.36k £3.34k £33.31k £135.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A