Financial history HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST

Charity number: 239415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £181 £192 £201 £162 £99
Total expenditure £181 £192 £201 £162 £99
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A