AUGUSTA ANNE DAWKINS AND JULIANA HARRIOT DAWKINS

Charity number: 239586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 February 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2020 26 January 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2018 21 January 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2017 Not Required