Financial history CHARITY OF THE REVEREND GEORGE FREDERICK FESSEY FOR COAL

Charity number: 239779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £87 £89 £50 £92 £98
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A