Financial history THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 239850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £105.10k £134.15k £123.35k £116.67k £129.22k
Total expenditure £104.71k £81.67k £134.98k £96.35k £90.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A