Financial history THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 239852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.30k £20.97k £16.47k £12.52k £17.03k
Total expenditure £12.03k £13.15k £18.25k £22.04k £13.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A