RIVINGTON PRESBYTERIAN CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 240302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.06k £16.24k £13.14k £15.29k £11.41k
Total expenditure £23.10k £20.29k £11.12k £13.19k £6.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A