Trustees RIVINGTON PRESBYTERIAN CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)
Charity number: 240302

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RICHARD HORROCKS | Chair | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jayne Atkins | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Walton | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Kershaw | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS OLDHAM | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul MARTIN | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE FISHER JP | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Paul Melvyn FAIRCLOUGH | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edmund HAIGHTON | Trustee | 31 July 2001 |
|
|||||
Frank ASCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Vince Gerard MCCULLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Charles BEARON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.