AMLWCH AND PENYSARN OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 240315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.34k £2.70k £1.02k £4.19k £3.07k
Total expenditure £2.24k £2.05k £1.80k £4.44k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A