THE BRECKNOCK WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 240671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.17k £1.46k £1.28k £1.31k £1.34k
Total expenditure £1.37k £2.38k £1.77k £1.82k £4.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A