Governing document RUTLAND AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GENERAL RULES AND CONDITIONS ADOPTED 24TH MARCH 1897 AMENDED 10TH JANUARY 1910, 8TH JANUARY 1912, 8TH FEBRUARY 1954, 24TH FEBRUARY 1961 AND 26TH FEBRUARY 1965. AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION WELL BEING AND EFFICIENCY OF AGRICULTURE AND ALL PROFESSIONS, TRADES AND CRAFTS CONNECTED THEREWITH. ARRANGING DEMONSTRATIONS CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTRAL EDUCATION. HOLDING OF ANNUAL SHOWS, GIVING OF PRIZES AND GRANTS TO FURTHER THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.