THE PEOPLE'S HALL

Charity number: 241032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £40.35k £33.08k £43.89k £34.94k £30.78k
Total expenditure £34.84k £36.27k £33.87k £29.86k £20.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A