Trustees THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND

Charity number: 241083

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

42 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop of London Chair 08 March 2018
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF ST KATHARINE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
The Venerable Katherine Jane Hedderly Trustee 15 April 2024
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Emma Gwynneth Ineson Trustee 19 February 2023
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Very Revd Andrew Tremlett Trustee 21 September 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
THE MISSION TO SEAFARERS
Received: On time
The Venerable Peter James Farley-Moore Trustee 10 April 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Paul Anton Imbaraj Nicholas Trustee 13 February 2022
BURNING HEART
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rt Revd Lusa Nsenga-Ngoy Trustee 25 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Peter Sinclair Trustee 04 January 2022
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Jacquie Driver Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HAM
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD SHOREDITCH
Overdue by 200 days
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Thomas Watts Trustee 11 November 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Stephen Garside Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Jonathan Wolstenholme Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Dr Toby Partridge Trustee 29 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Samuel Follett Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Ademola Adebajo Trustee 11 October 2021
BETHANY RELIEF AND REHABILITATION INTERNATIONAL (UK)
Received: On time
CHURCH REVITALISATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Samuel McNally-Cross Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Phillips Trustee 11 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Zi Ken Toh Trustee 20 September 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Margarita Ann Barr-Hamilton Trustee 20 September 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER TRUNDLE Trustee 20 September 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARK, CLERKENWELL
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
CLERKENWELL WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
Venerable Catherine Ruth Pickford Trustee 01 September 2020
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Venerable Richard Stephen Frank Trustee 20 April 2020
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
CHRISTCHURCH FELTHAM
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE'S COMMUNITY CARE TRUST
Received: On time
ACTIVATE SPORTS MINISTRY
Overdue by 200 days
The Rt Reverend Dr Joanne Woolway Grenfell Trustee 03 July 2019
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE WOODARD CORPORATION
Received: On time
RICHARD NICHOLAS PERRY Trustee 06 December 2018
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, TURNHAM GREEN
Received: On time
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH Trustee 20 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONFESSING ANGLICANS
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
WYCLIFFE HALL
Received: On time
Miss A Mclntyre Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
MRS S TETT Trustee 07 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, KENSINGTON
Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND EVANGELICAL COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ARCHDEACON OF LONDON Trustee 05 January 2016
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BY THE WARDROBE, LONDON
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE CASTLE BAYNARD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALDERMAN SAMUEL WILSON FUND
Received: On time
STATIONERS' HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN
Overdue by 200 days
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CLERGY STIPEND TRUST
Received: 64 days late
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
MR J THOMAS Trustee 02 November 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Revd G Hunter Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
Archdeacon of Hampstead Trustee 06 October 2015
THE LONDON CLERGY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: 102 days late
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
BISHOP OF ISLINGTON Trustee 29 September 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GRATITUDE INITIATIVE
Received: 49 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDMUND THE KING, ST MARY WOOLNOTH AND ST CLEMENT EASTCHEAP
Received: On time
Dr PHILLIP RICE Trustee 24 September 2015
ABRAHAM'S OASIS UK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, SHADWELL
Received: 43 days late
Mr D Hurst Trustee 24 September 2015
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE GREAT COMMISSION TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OF FULHAM Trustee 13 September 2013
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time
FORWARD IN FAITH
Received: On time
CHRISTINA TITILAYO SOSANYA Trustee 13 September 2013
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Dr CHRISTOPHER ROY MASON WARD Trustee 13 September 2013
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
BRIAN WILLIAM O'DONOGHUE Trustee 28 May 2012
ELTHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST
Received: On time
Gospel Support and Homes Trust Limited
Received: On time
THE SOLA TRUST
Received: On time
LONDON GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
Recently registered
Inigo Rodney Milman Woolf Trustee
THE GREIG TRUST
Received: On time
HAMPSTEAD CHURCHES YOUTH COMMITTEE
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD
Received: On time
ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOSEPH FOX
Received: On time
THE HAMPSTEAD CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
John Ronald Dolling Trustee
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE GATEHILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL NORTHWOOD
Received: On time
JOSILE WENUS ALEXANDRA MUNRO Trustee
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Received: On time
CLIVE RICHARD SCOWEN Trustee
LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Received: On time
THE CHARLES GARDNER MEMORIAL FUND
Overdue by 108 days
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ROXETH YOUTH ZONE
Overdue by 565 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ROXETH (HARROW)
Received: On time
THE MASENO PROJECT TRUST
Received: On time