THE WORTHAM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 241664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.68k £2.82k £7.97k £2.94k £2.42k
Total expenditure £2.37k £2.04k £3.15k £2.10k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A