Accounts and annual returns POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 241954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 14 March 2022 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 26 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 17 November 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required