Accounts and annual returns AVON AND SOMERSET CONSTABULARY WALEY COHEN FUND

Charity number: 242437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 December 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required