Financial history THE LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE ANIMAL AID ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 242560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £634.97k £539.44k £552.88k £1.17m £719.51k
Total expenditure £635.62k £691.21k £687.83k £695.43k £648.19k
Income from government contracts £6.36k £5.91k £5.08k £2.53k £3.60k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £471.22k £409.21k £384.82k £1.04m £570.46k
Income - Other trading activities £111.52k £86.79k £97.65k £83.41k £42.73k
Income - Charitable activities £30.76k £26.28k £29.03k £22.43k £29.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.46k £17.16k £41.37k £18.57k £19.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £57.47k
Income - Legacies £299.78k £198.31k £146.80k £750.25k £338.28k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £591.62k £634.44k £635.93k £660.68k £610.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.00k £56.77k £51.90k £34.75k £37.24k
Expenditure - Governance £12.99k £20.48k £12.55k £15.47k £16.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0