Trustees GWENT WILDLIFE TRUST LTD
Charity number: 242619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Leppard | Chair | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Howell | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Elizabeth Coleman | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Holland | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Newton | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Rees | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Marten Henry Stephens | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Finn | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Waller | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.