STONE PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 242840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.65k £18.82k £18.99k £19.70k £28.75k
Total expenditure £11.32k £22.60k £19.18k £20.18k £23.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k