THE DAVID PICKFORD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 243437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £24.44k £18.44k £19.88k £13.73k £7.07k
Total expenditure £95.92k £56.95k £62.48k £45.88k £66.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A