INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) LTD

Charity number: 243606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 07 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 18 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 18 May 2017 On time Download