THE BRIDGNORTH PARISH CHARITY

Charity number: 243890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.31k £8.82k £2.83k £14.74k £8.96k
Total expenditure £6.49k £400 £10.74k £9.06k £18.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A