BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 243931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £289.94k £231.62k £239.43k £148.49k £230.85k
Total expenditure £240.09k £228.20k £240.15k £263.62k £164.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A