CHURCH ESTATE (INCLUDING THE CHARITY OF SIR WILLIAM BLACKETT THE YOUNGER)

Charity number: 244047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time Download