THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 244519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 October 2016 On time Download