Financial history CHICHESTER MEDICAL EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 244559
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £171.21k £161.87k £176.59k £169.95k £112.44k
Total expenditure £94.10k £91.80k £112.99k £79.58k £81.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A