MORGAN FOR CHILD WELFARE AND CARE OF EXPECTANT MOTHERS

Charity number: 244682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.21k £5.23k £5.40k £4.36k £5.52k
Total expenditure £0 £960 £3.48k £3.96k £14.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A