ANNE DUCHESS OF WESTMINSTER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 245177
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £136.52k £140.23k £159.24k £149.47k £124.58k
Total expenditure £305.26k £346.47k £340.84k £306.40k £321.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A