CATHOLIC APOSTOLIC CHURCH - TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION THEREWITH

Charity number: 245250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £770.99k £789.77k £787.30k £798.70k £785.70k
Total expenditure £676.36k £853.74k £783.40k £1.06m £735.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £665 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06k £5.10k £0 £1.05k £379
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £769.93k £784.67k £786.64k £797.65k £785.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £582.18k £728.18k £670.12k £618.91k £549.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £94.17k £125.56k £113.27k £436.63k £185.54k
Expenditure - Governance £15.93k £15.14k £17.45k £15.70k £12.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £94.17k £125.56k £113.27k £436.63k £185.54k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0