Dogfen lywodraethu THE 4TH DIVISION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 05/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (A) TO PROMOTE THE MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE ARMY AND WHO ARE SERVING IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA FORMERLY KNOWN AS 4TH DIVISION; AND (B) TO RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED , HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSON IN NEED BY (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.