Dogfen lywodraethu THE EXMOOR SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 14TH OCTOBER 1969 AND AMENDED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1988, 22 SEPTEMBER 1990, 21 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 1994 AND SEPTEMBER 1995 AND SEPTEMBER 1996.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CONCERT ACTION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT, PROTECTION, AND CONSERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND OTHER AMENITIES IN THE EXMOOR NATION PARK; THE SAFEGUARDING OF PUBLIC ACCESS, AND THE HUSBANDING OF ITS ANTIQUITIES, FLORA AND FAUNA, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND TO PROMOTE CONCERN FOR, AND TO ACHIEVE IMPROVEMENT IN, THE STANDARD OF PLANNING AND DESIGN, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO TOWNS, VILLAGES, AND OTHER SETTLEMENTS AND THEIR BUILDINGS IN THE NATIONAL PARK. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF THE OBJECTS SEE CONSTITUTION
Maes buddion
EXMOOR NATIONAL PARK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.