THE CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE OF WOMEN AND GIRLS - ENFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 245773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 February 2018 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required