OSWALDTWISTLE OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 246887
Charity reporting is overdue by 1693 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A