THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 246902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Col Simon Aubrey Craycroft Frere-Cook MBE Trustee 28 March 2014
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
BRIG TAL GLASS Chair 28 June 2013
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
LT COL NTR STEEVENSON Trustee 28 June 2013
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
MAJ RW COLEMAN MBE Trustee 24 August 2012
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
MAJ IPB TAYLOR TD Trustee
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
MR PM KIRBY Trustee 28 June 2013
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
Lt Col CF Warren Trustee 22 September 2011
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
Col Paul Anthony Davis CBE Trustee 01 October 2019
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
Lt Col SJ Nye MBE Trustee 28 March 2014
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
Maj Gen Douglas Chalmers DSO OBE Trustee 11 February 2016
PRINCESS OF WALES'S ROYAL REGIMENT (QUEEN'S AND ROYAL HAMPSHIRES) BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time