Accounts and annual returns ABBEYFIELD (CHELSEA AND FULHAM) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 246993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 11 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 21 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window