Financial history THE CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 247465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £51.28k £66.88k £156.92k £56.00k £61.95k
Total expenditure £109.79k £34.44k £143.37k £62.28k £1.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A