THE RICHARD DIMBLEBY CANCER FUND

Charity number: 247558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £251.02k £247.00k £186.22k £195.65k £203.24k
Total expenditure £276.91k £484.22k £279.33k £515.48k £228.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A