Trustees ANN PYTT'S CHARITY

Charity number: 247891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM DUNCAN MACKINNON Trustee 15 November 2023
MR AND MRS DUNCAN MACKINNON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Overdue by 108 days
Wolfgang Bauer Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
susan margaret meech Trustee 13 October 2023
None on record
Susan Anne Bauer Trustee 21 September 2021
SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ASTHAL SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Thomas David Putt Trustee 19 November 2019
SOUTH CENTRAL GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF BURFORD CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST
Received: On time
THE BURFORD BENEFICE BARTHOLOMEW TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASTHALL, SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, BURFORD
Received: On time
THE BURFORD AND UPTON AND SIGNET WELFARE TRUST
Overdue by 205 days
THE BURFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE BURFORD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ASTHALL CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ASTHAL SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBIN JAMES MEECH Trustee 15 January 2009
THE ASTHAL SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASTHALL, SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD
Recently registered
EDWARD JAMES WALKER Trustee
THE ASTHAL SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time