CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 248781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 December 2018 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required