Financial history HENRY BIRCH FUND

Charity number: 249238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.99k £1.88k £1.91k £1.79k £1.57k
Total expenditure £1.80k £1.09k £1.30k £889 £2.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A