Financial history THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 249318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £12.99m £12.81m £12.76m £12.29m £14.28m
Total expenditure £12.09m £11.90m £12.27m £12.32m £12.76m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £181.87k £22.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.08m £9.15m £9.30m £8.76m £9.49m
Income - Other trading activities £1.33m £836.00k £460.00k £886.00k £1.54m
Income - Charitable activities £861.00k £867.00k £861.00k £939.00k £864.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.40m £1.55m £1.51m £1.43m £1.45m
Income - Other £332.00k £402.00k £625.00k £272.00k £928.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.92m £11.47m £11.78m £11.88m £11.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.17m £428.00k £491.00k £436.00k £1.01m
Expenditure - Governance £147.00k £150.00k £161.00k £224.00k £213.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £889.00k £911.00k £938.00k £1.06m £958.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £302.00k £112.00k £130.00k £107.00k £150.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0