PAPUA NEW GUINEA CHURCH PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 249446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £60.64k £60.87k £40.66k £36.37k £31.77k
Total expenditure £21.01k £37.26k £42.38k £53.49k £20.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A