Accounts and annual returns BLACKPOOL SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS

Charity number: 249596
Charity reporting is up to date (220 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 March 2022 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 March 2022 220 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 August 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 August 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 August 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 August 2018 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late Download Open in new window