Trustees BRAMPTON BIERLOW WELFARE TRUST
Charity number: 249838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WALTER CUTTS | Chair |
|
||||||
Asher Williams | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Armatage | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Barbara Sunderland | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Don Keating | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor David Roche | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLIE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN PEACE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.