Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF READING HOSPITALS
Charity number: 249956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Dolinski | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|||||
GARY BROOKS | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Josephine Wragg | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Richards | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Haitham Taylor | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
juliet sherratt | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Wiggins | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||
rebecca ward | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carrollanne Lindley | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID CLIVE HARRIES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.