Financial history THE MOTHERS' UNION (COVENTRY DIOCESE)

Charity number: 250129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £46.38k £43.33k £31.88k £31.67k £21.13k
Total expenditure £38.42k £38.55k £29.66k £30.09k £29.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A