Trustees PHILHARMONIA LTD

Charity number: 250277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord King of Lothbury Mervyn Allister King Chair 10 September 2020
PHILHARMONIA TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
James Samuel Buckle Trustee 09 February 2021
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Lawrence Alexander Rolton Trustee 10 December 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Heidi Maria Krutzen Trustee 10 December 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Kira Doherty Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Michael Whittier Fuller Trustee 10 September 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Antoine Gilles Sigure Trustee 10 September 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Julia Zilberman Trustee 01 April 2020
ZILBERMAN FILM FOUNDATION
Recently registered
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Daniel Arnoud Knottenbelt Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Lorenzo Simone Modiano Trustee 01 April 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Michael John Brindle QC Trustee 01 April 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
JON SAUL NATHAN Trustee 01 April 2020
THE LAURENCE MODIANO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Sir Peter Edward Middleton Trustee 01 April 2020
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Nuno Carapina Trustee 16 December 2019
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Cheremie Hamilton-Miller Trustee 06 December 2018
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Rupert Harry Darbyshire Trustee 09 March 2018
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Laurent Ben Slimane Trustee 13 December 2013
THE MARTIN MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time