Financial history DAUGHTERS OF OUR LADY OF GOOD COUNSEL AND ST PAUL OF THE CROSS

Charity number: 250451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £98.90k £140.87k £306.42k £79.45k £79.31k
Total expenditure £131.83k £133.65k £157.88k £149.34k £118.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A